Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
J. Mcdonald Co., Inc., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Terrazas, Kevin, against Crowe, David E., Eyeington, April, Tropical & Losee, Llc, represented by Everett, Hope, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Submission | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Objections | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Post-Judgment: Modification - Other (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.