Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Leheney, Linda Kay Norman filed a(n) Succession of Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLocke, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryMuniment Of Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeSuccession of Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Muniment of Title | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUESTS | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Returned | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | WILL | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | New Cases or Applications Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.