Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connick, Gretchen O. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bruno, Rickie Imon, represented by Phelps, Shane, Wilkinson, Sarah Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEFERRED ADJUDICATION SIGNED | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Waiver of Extradition | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Attorney | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.