Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mahowald, Blake, represented by Andreski, Donald R., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Elliott, Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Kenny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Non-Traffic |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE TRIAL | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Scanned Case | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Disposition | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.