Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Russell, Blake Weston, represented by Gustitis, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Elliott, Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Kenny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2020 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Comment | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Scanned Case | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Comment | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Disposition | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Disposition | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | COMMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.