Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cicchetto, Michael D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perry-Cicchetto, Erin G., in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2017 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 11/13/2020 Reset by Court to 01/15/2021 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 08/19/2020 Reset by Court to 09/16/2020 | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.