Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miles, Abbie L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vij, Vikram, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 12/09/2021 Reset by Court to 12/07/2021 | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.