Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Jordan, Shannon, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jordan, James Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family - Transfer In |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Merits Agreed Resolution CANCELED Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) Agreed Resolution 01/14/2021 Reset by Court to 03/03/2021 03/03/2021 Reset by Court to 04/15/2021 |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) 01/14/2021 Reset by Court to 03/03/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.