Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thibodeaux, Micca Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thibodeaux, Robert Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2014 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 01/26/2021 Reset by Court to 01/28/2021 | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.