Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Betancourt, Kenny, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brent M. Cordell, against Rgv Home Services Llc, represented by Lee A Mencacci, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Terri T. Holder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerri T. Holder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jessica) | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Ancillary Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jessica) | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jessica) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.