Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Goode, Carolyn Ann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Seth Park, against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., represented by Troy D. Helling, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County. This case was filed in Brazoria County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Served 09/14/2021 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Unserved | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.