Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Erika Yvonne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzalez Valencia, Rey Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNunc Pro Tunc |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Nunc Pro Tunc | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.