Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patrick, Connie Sue, Patrick, Bill E., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Matthew B. Edquist, against The Estate Of Gerald L. Long, All Unknown Heirs Of Gerald L. Long, represented by Williams M. Tigner, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation The Estate of Gerald L. Long Served 10/26/2021 8:21 AM Serving Officer Thomas, Tabitha | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation The Estate of Gerald L. Long Unserved | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.