Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perry, Sheryl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Travis B. Terry, against Jones, Marty, represented by Matthew C. Moore, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand - with Jury Fee Payment | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Jones, Marty Served 09/04/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.