Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jones, Ericka Warnita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Jordan Kristopher, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 09/14/2021 Reset by Court to 09/28/2021 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.