Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mitchell, Eric, Sr., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Erinn G. Brown, against Monroe, Wanda Gage, represented by W David Torok, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Terri T. Holder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerri T. Holder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Ancillary Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holder, Terri) | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.