Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stamp, Dwayne Ty, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Greene, Irene Sarah, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryPcr - Paternity/Parentage |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Merits Agreed Resolution CANCELED Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) Agreed Resolution 04/27/2022 Reset by Court to 07/06/2022 07/06/2022 Reset by Court to 09/07/2022 |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.