Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Occupant, Gil, Yolanda, Gil, Fausto J., in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Justin R. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJustin R. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Expedited Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Foreclosure (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Mail Return | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by First Class Mail Gil, Fausto J. Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Mail Gil, Yolanda Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Mail Occupant Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Mail | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Gil, Fausto J. Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Certified Mail Gil, Yolanda Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Certified Mail Occupant Served 08/23/2021 Anticipated Method Certified Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.