Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Foote, Kennitra M., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Jeffrey R. Vaughan, against The State Bar Of Texas, represented by Khadija T. Roberts, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Justin R. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJustin R. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Worksheet | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.