Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harshman, Jerusha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harshman, Cayce, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Family (OCA) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.