Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Special Prosecution Unit, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Roy, William Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Sexual Predator |
Last RefreshedJune 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Worksheet | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Supplemental |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.