Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meridiana Community Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jonathan H. Clark, against Sapp, Nekesa, Sapp, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) 12/15/2021 Reset by Court to 12/15/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Sapp, Gerald Served 10/07/2021 Sapp, Nekesa Served 10/07/2021 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Sapp, Gerald Unserved Sapp, Nekesa Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.