Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Deason, Benjamin, filed a(n) Pcr - Custody/Visitation case against Moore, Sabrina, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Joe Patrick Bulanek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoe Patrick Bulanek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryPcr - Custody/Visitation |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Passed CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) Passed |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Response | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) 11/20/2023 Reset by Court to 11/29/2023 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Agreed Resolution CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) Agreed Resolution 10/25/2023 Reset by Court to 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Reset by Court to 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Reset by Court to 11/06/2023 |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Passed CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) Passed |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.