Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Maria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Passed CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) Passed |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.