Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyna, Veronica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyna, Donaciano Jr., in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce No Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Uncontested (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 01/08/2021 Reset by Court to 01/13/2021 | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.