Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gulf Coast Concrete And Shell, Inc., Rameriz, Faustino, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Sean M Higgins, against Bautista, Soamy, Sierra, Juan, Sierra, Nicholas, represented by Arden J Morley, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Justin R. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJustin R. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Sierra, Nicholas Unserved Bautista, Soamy Served 08/11/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Opinion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.