Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Osigwe, Bright Hyginus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bright-Osigwe, Amaka Vicky, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Merits Agreed Resolution CANCELED Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) Agreed Resolution |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) 10/31/2022 Reset by Court to 11/02/2022 | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisment | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Merits (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.