Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2021 |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Other CANCELED Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) Other |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Uncontested (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.