Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Young, Eva, Young, Peyton, Young, Zara, Youn, Jerry Young And Chantelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Clarence Williams, Tia Shanay Williams And Claren, Williams, Tia Shanay, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1 with MOTZ, PAUL A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOTZ, PAUL A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryInjury/Damage: Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Minor Prove Up | ||
August 11, 2023 |
Notice (e-File) Notice of Hearing |
||
August 08, 2023 |
Proposed Order (e-File) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion |
||
August 08, 2023 |
Motion for New Trial (eFile) Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial |
||
July 12, 2023 |
Proposed Order (e-File) Proposed Order |
||
June 20, 2023 |
Proposed Order (e-File) Executed Judgment for Minor |
||
May 09, 2023 |
Motion to Appoint Agreed Motion for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem |
||
May 09, 2023 |
Proposed Order (e-File) Proposed Order for Agreed Motion for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem |
||
March 06, 2023 |
No Fee Documents (e-File) Plaintiff's Request |
||
January 30, 2023 | Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.