Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Properti, Alvin Hale By Blessed, filed a(n) Other Civil case against Occup, Valerie Williams And All, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1 with Parker, Jeanne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeParker, Jeanne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Jury Trial | ||
January 05, 2021 |
Docket ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES |
||
January 05, 2021 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JUDGE |
||
January 05, 2021 |
Docket JUDGES CIVIL DOCKET |
||
January 05, 2021 |
Docket *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 20-71 |
||
January 04, 2021 |
Docket FINAL JUDGMENT/S/JP |
||
January 04, 2021 | Converted Case Dispostion Event - Case Clock Stopped | ||
January 04, 2021 | Appeal | ||
December 14, 2020 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JUDGE |
||
December 04, 2020 |
Docket NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.