Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mercury County Mutual Ins. Co.,, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hallman, Shamar Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1 with Parker, Jeanne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeParker, Jeanne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryInjury/Damage: Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeNot Final |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2022 |
Request (e-File) Request Certiciate of No appeal MAILED TO ATTORNEY OFFICE |
||
January 26, 2022 |
Order - All Other FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
||
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Parker, Jeanne |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) Motion for Final Summary Judgment |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (e-File) Order for Final Summary Judgment |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Parker, Jeanne |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (e-File) Notice of Hearing to Defendant |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (e-File) Proposed Order on Motion for Entry of Default Judgment |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Entry of Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.