Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
In Re, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against J Mason, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryAnnuity Benefits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE- DOCK | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 16-1 | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SALE | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CC OF ORDER TO PLNTF'S ATTY | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JEANNE GUTHRIE- DOCKET | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR JANUARY 21 2016 10:30AM | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | APP FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RIGHTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.