Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jacob Brown, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL STORAGE BOX 16-13 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL 16-13 | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - ELLAN & ASSOCIATES srv- | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI ELLAN & ASSOCIATES | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ELLEN & ASSOCIATES | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI JACOB BROWN | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $8000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.