Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carillo Family Trust, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Michael Cardiel, Michael Cardiel And All Occupa, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryJp Appeal/All Other Filings |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FROM 3RD COURT OF APPEAL | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MANDATE FROM 3RD COURT OF APPEAL | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | THIRD COURT OF APPEALS JUDGMENT RENDERED 7/6/16 | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OPINION | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THIRD COURT OF APPEALS | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | RTN CCM 2883 UNCLAIMED | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RTN CCM 2975 RTN TO SENDER UNCLAIMED UTF | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | INMATE SERVICE REQUEST | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | POSS is Filed - MICHAEL CARDIEL AND ALL OCCUPA s |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.