Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duke Capital Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Amanda C Woodrum, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2015 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 15-17 | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CC OF DISMISSAL TO ALL PARTIES | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | PLNTF'S MTN TO DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION AMANDA C WOODRUM | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PLNTF'S ORIG PETITION, REQ FOR DISC & REQ FOR ADMN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.