Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Desmond Lee Bryant, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-27 | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - DESMOND LEE BRYANT UNSERVED | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT-SURETY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | AAARDVARK BAIL BONDS | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $3000 | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI DESMOND LEE BRYANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.