Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Desmond Evon Wilkerson, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-20 | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - DESMOND EVON WILKERSON UNSERVED | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | QUIK RELEASE BAIL BONDS | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI DESMOND EVON WILKERSON | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $3000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.