Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kimble, Jerry Dewayne, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2 with Mischtian, John M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMischtian, John M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2015 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-31 |
||
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-31 | |
September 01, 2015 |
Docket AGREED JUDGMENT |
||
September 01, 2015 | Converted Case Dispostion Event - Case Clock Stopped | ||
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT | |
June 11, 2015 |
Docket DEFENDANT-SURETY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
||
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT-SURETY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
May 20, 2015 |
Docket NISI is Filed - JERRY DEWAYNE KIMBLE UNSERVED na Receiver/Contact INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS |
||
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - JERRY DEWAYNE KIMBLE UNSERVED | |
May 14, 2015 |
Docket PRINT SERVICE- NISI JERRY DEWAYNE KIMBLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.