Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jennifer L Lopez-Burgos, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-16 | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER BY GOOD | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - JENNIFER L LOPEZ-BURGOS UNSERVED | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ALWAYS OPEN BAIL BONDS | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $6000 | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI JENNIFER L LOPEZ-BURGOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.