Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, Equable Ascent Financial Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Sandra E Silvera, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | CCM 9225 RETURNED S/S SILVERA 06/25/2012 | |
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CCM 9225 SANDRA E SILVERA/NOTICE OF DJ SENT | |
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW CLERK | |
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRATNING DEFAULT JDGMNT | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW CLERK | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ACCOUNT STATEMENTS FOR EVIDENCE | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/UPSTAIRS | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | PL'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JDGMT DEINED, LTTR SENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.