Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Sally Scott, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 12-04 | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NON SUIT | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW'S DESK/CLRK | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | PL'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NON-SUIT, TO RD | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CIT is Filed - SALLY SCOTT srv-12/20/11 | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIG PETITION AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.