Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hilco Receivables Llc, Equable Ascent Financial Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Robert Constancio, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | RTN MAIL ROBERT CONSTANCIO NO MAIL RECEPTACLE | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 14-29 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MAILED COPIES TO ALL 3 PARTIES | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW CLERKD | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW CLERKD | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.