Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Total Resource Auctions-Temple, filed a(n) Suit For Certificate Of Title/Auto case against Texas Dept Motor Vehicles, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2011 |
CategorySuit For Certificate Of Title/Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NO COPIES OR ENVELOPE PROVIDED TO RETURN DOCUMENTS | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO box 13-4 | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL/S/RAD 4/19/2013 | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW CLERK | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEF TX DEPT OF MOTOR VEHINCLES, SOLDANO | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | PLT'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.