Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, Citibank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against James L Hill, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 5877/JAMES L HILL/CAROL HILL SGD 07/16/11 | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/JAMES L HILL, CCM 5877 | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MERGER OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JUDGE DEPEW | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT W/EXHIBITS | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RD | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | C is Filed - JAMES L HILL srv-02/10/11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.