Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Claudia I Stack, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 3810/CLAUDIA STACK, SGD 04/09/11 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CO-ORD | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/CLAUDIA I STACK, CCM 3810 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RD | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CO-ORD | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | C is Filed - CLAUDIA I STACK srv-02/15/11 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION CLAUDIA I STACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.