Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kevin James Olmstead, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2011 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COUNTY ATTORNEY (CURRIER) | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 11-09 | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - Out Sooner Bail Bond SERVED | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI Out Sooner Bail Bond | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI KEVIN JAMES OLMSTEAD | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | OUT SOONER BAIL BONDS 81 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.