Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Amelia Vargas, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 12-05 | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/CLRK | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 12-02 | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NON-SUIT | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW/CLRK | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR NON-SUIT, TO RD | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.