Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aqua Finance Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Georgia Jones, George Jones, George Jones Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2007 |
CategorySuit On Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | FILE BK GRN CD FOR GEORGE & GEORGIA JONES/S/GJONES | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG TO DEFS, CCM 4112 | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG W/AFFS | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - GEORGIA JONES srv-09/28/07 | |
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - GEORGE JONES srv-09/28/07 | |
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION GEORGIA JONES | |
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.