Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyse Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Credit Cards case against Bridgeda Leticia Kolb-Atchley-Corn, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Credit Cards |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 1335/BRIGEDA CORN SGD 07/03/07 | |
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | COPY OF D/F MAILED CCM TO DEF | |
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | COPIES MAILED TO ATTY | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF/JUDG SENT BCK TO JUDGE | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - BRIDGEDA LETICIA KOLB-ATCHLEY-CORN | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | MTN FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG W/AFFS | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDG (CANNOT SIGN-CITATION NOT RETURNED) | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION BRIDGEDA LETICIA KOLB | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL PETITION W/DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.