Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bluebonnet Financial Assets, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Sybel Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED ATTY COVER LETTER | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED RELEASE OF JUDGMENT | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | EXEC is Filed - SYBEL MARTINEZ srv-06/07/17 | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | LTR TO CHANGE ATTY | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CT COORD | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | CC OF ORDER TO PLNTFS ATTY ANDREW C. OLIVIO | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CT COORD | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR NOVEMBER 13,2013 9:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.